TX HB929 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the time for returning ballots mailed by certain federal postcard applicants.
Title
Relating to the time for returning ballots mailed by certain federal postcard applicants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1947 (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1165 (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - RV#1164 (Y: 119 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1165 (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - RV#1164 (Y: 119 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | House discharges conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed |