TX HB926 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of information from the internal verification system of the Department of Public Safety for voter registration purposes.
Title
Relating to the use of information from the internal verification system of the Department of Public Safety for voter registration purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |