TX HB925 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to enhancing the penalty prescribed for certain acts of official oppression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to enhancing the penalty prescribed for certain acts of official oppression.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback