TX HB924 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain Texas Rangers for burial in the state cemetery.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain Texas Rangers for burial in the state cemetery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |