TX HB920 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of medication designated for treatment of respiratory distress on public and private school campuses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of medication designated for treatment of respiratory distress on public and private school campuses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2023-05-05HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 294
2023-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-03-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2023-03-02HouseRead first time
2022-12-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB294 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB294 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback