TX HB919 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and firearm ammunition within the State of Texas.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and firearm ammunition within the State of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] |
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. David Spiller [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB499 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
SB513 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
SB513 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS FIREARM PROTECTION ACT
Weapons
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS FIREARM PROTECTION ACT
Weapons
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB919 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00919I.htm |