TX HB916 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the governing board of the Trinity Valley Community College District.
Title
Relating to the governing board of the Trinity Valley Community College District.
Sponsors
Rep. Stuart Spitzer [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |