TX HB912 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-37)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to images captured by unmanned aircraft and other images and recordings; providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to images captured by unmanned aircraft and other images and recordings; providing penalties.

Sponsors

Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Debbie Riddle [R]Rep. Lon Burnam [D]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Jimmie Aycock [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Daniel Branch [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. William Callegari [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Stefani Carter [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Rep. Myra Crownover [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. John Davis [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Craig Eiland [D]
Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Marsha Farney [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Patricia Harless [R]Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. James Keffer [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Susan King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. George Lavender [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Marisa Marquez [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. Ruth McClendon [D]Sen. Borris Miles [D]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D]
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Rob Orr [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jim Pitts [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Bennett Ratliff [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. David Simpson [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Mark Strama [D]
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. Scott Turner [R]Rep. Mike Villarreal [D]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Sen. Craig Estes [R]

Roll Calls

2013-05-26 - House - HB 912Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - HB 912Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-27SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2013-05-27HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2013-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseRecord vote
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2013-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26SenateRemarks ordered printed
2013-05-26SenateRecord vote
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2013-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2013-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2013-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2013-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2013-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2013-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-21SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2013-05-21SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2013-05-21HouseHouse appoints conferees
2013-05-21HouseHouse requests conference committee
2013-05-21HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2013-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-17HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenatePassed
2013-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateAmended
2013-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-17SenateLaid out as postponed business
2013-05-17SenatePostponed
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateAmendment amended
2013-05-17SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2013-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateAmended
2013-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-13SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-10SenateReferred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
2013-05-10SenateRead first time
2013-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-10HouseRecord vote
2013-05-10HousePassed as amended
2013-05-10HouseAmended
2013-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmendment tabled
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2013-02-25HouseRead first time
2013-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback