TX HB900 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a clarification of the law governing eligibility of certain events for funding under the Major Events trust fund.
Title
Relating to a clarification of the law governing eligibility of certain events for funding under the Major Events trust fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-03-26 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-03-24 | House | Postponed |
2015-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-03-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General