TX HB9 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the contributions to and benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the contributions to and benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors

Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-04-24HouseCompanion considered in lieu of CSSB 12
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB12 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback