TX HB9 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 86-27)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to maternal health and safety, pregnancy-related deaths, and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to maternal health and safety, pregnancy-related deaths, and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.

Sponsors

Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Carol Alvarado [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-08-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#28 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - House - Amended RV#23 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - House - RV#21 RV#22 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - House - RV#21 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-08-01SenateRead first time
2017-08-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-01HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-01HouseRecord vote
2017-08-01HousePassed
2017-08-01HouseRead 3rd time
2017-07-31HouseRecord vote
2017-07-31HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseRecord vote
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseRecord vote
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseRead 2nd time
2017-07-31HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-07-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback