TX HB897 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the recording of a proceeding in a municipal court in San Antonio.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the recording of a proceeding in a municipal court in San Antonio.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-03-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-03-24HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2015-02-26HouseRead first time
2015-01-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback