TX HB897 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation in secondary education curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation in secondary education curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - House - HB 897Third Reading House (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - HB 897Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - SUSPEND CONSTITUTIONAL RULE (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22HouseRecord vote
2013-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenatePassed
2013-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-29SenateReferred to Education
2013-04-29SenateRead first time
2013-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-26HouseRecord vote
2013-04-26HousePassed
2013-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-26HouseRecord vote
2013-04-26HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2013-04-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-26HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-04-26HouseAmended
2013-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB897
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00897I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00897H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00897E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00897S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00897F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB897&RcdVtNo=356&Ch=H&Dt=04/26/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB897&RcdVtNo=359&Ch=H&Dt=04/26/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB897&RcdVtNo=1118&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2013

Bill Comments 750

feedback