TX HB896 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to allowable transfers to the Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission of proceeds from the taxes on the sale, storage, or use of sporting goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to allowable transfers to the Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission of proceeds from the taxes on the sale, storage, or use of sporting goods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-16HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2013-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2013-04-11HouseReferred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Appropriations
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback