TX HB890 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to remotely conducting depositions, hearings, and other proceedings in juvenile cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to remotely conducting depositions, hearings, and other proceedings in juvenile cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback