TX HB890 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing information to the public and to purchasers of real property regarding the impact of military installations.
Title
Relating to providing information to the public and to purchasers of real property regarding the impact of military installations.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#151 (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#146 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#151 (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#146 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Military & Veterans
Open Records
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Military & Veterans
Open Records
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property