TX HB888 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting a child as a family member at a port of entry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creating the criminal offense of misrepresenting a child as a family member at a port of entry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1775 (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#899 (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#898 (Y: 16 N: 123 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1775
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-06SenateRead first time
2019-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#899
2019-05-02HousePassed as amended
2019-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseAmended 2-Canales
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#898
2019-05-02HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Middleton
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Rodriguez and Hernandez
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB888
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00888I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00888H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00888E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00888S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00888F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB888&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB888&RcdVtNo=899&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB888&RcdVtNo=1775&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback