TX HB884 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a revision of the essential knowledge and skills of the public school foundation curriculum and proclamations for the production of instructional materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a revision of the essential knowledge and skills of the public school foundation curriculum and proclamations for the production of instructional materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1163 (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1138 (Y: 104 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed
2017-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-23HouseRead first time
2017-01-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback