TX HB88 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to interactions between law enforcement and individuals detained or arrested on suspicion of the commission of criminal offenses, witnesses to the commission of those offenses, and other members of the public, to peace officer liability for those interactions, and to the confinement, conviction, or release of detained or arrested individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interactions between law enforcement and individuals detained or arrested on suspicion of the commission of criminal offenses, witnesses to the commission of those offenses, and other members of the public, to peace officer liability for those interactions, and to the confinement, conviction, or release of detained or arrested individuals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB161 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Withdrawn by the Author
SB1224 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback