TX HB878 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the Sweeny Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the Sweeny Hospital District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2009-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
LOANS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
SWEENY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
LOANS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
SWEENY HOSPITAL DISTRICT