TX HB875 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibition of housing discrimination on the basis of age or certain housing needs and to the enforcement of that prohibition.
Title
Relating to the prohibition of housing discrimination on the basis of age or certain housing needs and to the enforcement of that prohibition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-18 | House | Filed |