TX HB871 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to use of telemedicine medical service by certain trauma facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of telemedicine medical service by certain trauma facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#457 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-16HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-16SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#457
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback