TX HB870 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the date on which certain persons placed on deferred adjudication community supervision are eligible to file a petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.
Title
Relating to the date on which certain persons placed on deferred adjudication community supervision are eligible to file a petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION