TX HB86 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criteria for review by the Sunset Advisory Commission of an agency that licenses an occupation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criteria for review by the Sunset Advisory Commission of an agency that licenses an occupation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - House - HB 86Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-17SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-16HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-16HouseRecord vote
2013-05-16HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-15SenateRecord vote
2013-05-15SenatePassed
2013-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-15SenateRecord vote
2013-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-13SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-04-18SenateRead first time
2013-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-10HouseRecord vote
2013-04-10HousePassed
2013-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-03-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-03-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-03-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-04HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2013-02-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-02-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-02-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-05HouseReferred to Government Efficiency & Reform
2013-02-05HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback