TX HB859 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the expunction of all records and files related to arrests for certain decriminalized misdemeanor offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the expunction of all records and files related to arrests for certain decriminalized misdemeanor offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#527 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#527
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback