TX HB854 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the punishment for the offense of unlawfully carrying a handgun by a license holder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the punishment for the offense of unlawfully carrying a handgun by a license holder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Amended RV#960 (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#960
2021-05-11HousePassed as amended
2021-05-11HouseAmended 1-Romero
2021-05-11HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-11HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Romero
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback