TX HB846 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the implementation of student financial assistance programs for veterans and their families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the implementation of student financial assistance programs for veterans and their families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1884 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-19SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-04-19SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-13HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-13HouseRecord vote
2017-04-13HousePassed
2017-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-13HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-22HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback