TX HB834 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulating the custody transfer of an adopted child; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulating the custody transfer of an adopted child; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1447 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#661 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-18HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-18HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenateAmended
2017-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2017-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2017-02-23HouseRead first time
2017-01-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback