TX HB832 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state funding for baccalaureate degree programs offered at certain public junior colleges.
Title
Relating to state funding for baccalaureate degree programs offered at certain public junior colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#555 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS