TX HB831 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the basic peace officer training course, including training for peace officers on the prohibition against the intentional use of certain neck restraints.
Title
Relating to the basic peace officer training course, including training for peace officers on the prohibition against the intentional use of certain neck restraints.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Ann Johnson [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB268 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety