TX HB827 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the county regulation of certain BYOB establishments; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the county regulation of certain BYOB establishments; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Miscellaneous
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Miscellaneous