TX HB826 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an annual report on the financial impact of undocumented immigrants on the state budget and economy.
Title
Relating to an annual report on the financial impact of undocumented immigrants on the state budget and economy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB826 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00826I.htm |