TX HB817 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the computation of taxable margin for purposes of the franchise tax by certain taxable entities.
Title
Relating to the computation of taxable margin for purposes of the franchise tax by certain taxable entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-25 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-04-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB817 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00817I.htm |