TX HB816 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state and to make certain recommendations regarding those laws, to criminal offenses previously compiled in statutes outside the Penal Code, to repealing certain of those offenses, and to conforming punishments for certain of those offenses to the penalty structure provided in the Penal Code; increasing the punishment for the criminal offenses of sedition, sabotage, and capital sabotage; imposing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a commission to review certain penal laws of this state and to make certain recommendations regarding those laws, to criminal offenses previously compiled in statutes outside the Penal Code, to repealing certain of those offenses, and to conforming punishments for certain of those offenses to the penalty structure provided in the Penal Code; increasing the punishment for the criminal offenses of sedition, sabotage, and capital sabotage; imposing a civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#243
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-14HouseAmended 2-Krause, Anchia, and Martinez
2021-04-14HouseAmended 1-Krause
2021-04-14HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-04-14HousePostponed 4/14/21 12:15 PM
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback