TX HB812 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the amount of the health care services fee paid by certain inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the amount of the health care services fee paid by certain inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#246 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-19SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-19SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-17HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-17HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-17HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#246
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-09HouseAmended 1-White
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback