TX HB805 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to access to certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials by patients with severe chronic diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to access to certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials by patients with severe chronic diseases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback