TX HB800 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to covered benefits under the child health plan.
Title
Relating to covered benefits under the child health plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#368 (Y: 81 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Amended RV#346 (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - RV#345 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Amended RV#346 (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - RV#345 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#368 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#346 |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 2-Frank |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#345 |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Howard |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB148 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
FAMILY PLANNING & BIRTH CONTROL
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety