TX HB80 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the discharge by certain defendants of fines and costs through community service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the discharge by certain defendants of fines and costs through community service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#259 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#259
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-22HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB80
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00080I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00080H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00080E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00080S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00080F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00080I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00080H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00080H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00080E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00080E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=259&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=84

Bill Comments 750

feedback