TX HB80 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, including a related study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, including a related study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#41 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-08-01 - House - Amended RV#34 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-08-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-08-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-08-10SenateRead first time
2017-08-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-02HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-02HouseRecord vote
2017-08-02HousePassed
2017-08-02HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-01HouseRecord vote
2017-08-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-08-01HouseAmended
2017-08-01HouseAmended
2017-08-01HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-07-31HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback