TX HB792 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to use an alternate work schedule for police dispatchers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to use an alternate work schedule for police dispatchers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB792
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00792I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00792H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00792S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00792F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00792I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00792H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00792E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00792E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB792&RcdVtNo=417&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=28

Bill Comments

feedback