TX HB791 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to displaying a firearm at or near a public demonstration; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to displaying a firearm at or near a public demonstration; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB311 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs