TX HB789 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to minimum scores required for students in certain school districts to pass an examination for acceleration or for credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to minimum scores required for students in certain school districts to pass an examination for acceleration or for credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-01SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseRules suspended
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-28HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2017-01-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback