TX HB788 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study on the assessments used by the Board of Pardons and Paroles to make parole decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study on the assessments used by the Board of Pardons and Paroles to make parole decisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#933 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#933
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback