TX HB787 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to conditions of community supervision prohibiting contact with certain persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to conditions of community supervision prohibiting contact with certain persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#245 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-24SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#245
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Corrections
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB787
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00787I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00787H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00787E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00787S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00787F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00787I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00787H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00787H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00787E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00787E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB787&RcdVtNo=245&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=234

Bill Comments 750

feedback