TX HB787 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the security of the electric grid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the security of the electric grid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1087 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-08HousePostponed
2017-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-08HousePostponed
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-23HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-23HouseRead first time
2017-01-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback