TX HB785 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to behavior improvement plans and behavioral intervention plans for certain public school students and notification and documentation requirements regarding certain behavior management techniques.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to behavior improvement plans and behavioral intervention plans for certain public school students and notification and documentation requirements regarding certain behavior management techniques.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#111 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective immediately
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Education
2021-04-12SenateRead first time
2021-04-08SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08HouseRecord vote RV#111
2021-04-08HousePassed
2021-04-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-07HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB785
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00785I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00785H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00785E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00785S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00785F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00785I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00785H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00785H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00785E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00785E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB785&RcdVtNo=111&Ch=H&Dt=04/08/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments 750

feedback