TX HB773 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the cremation of human remains by alkaline hydrolysis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the cremation of human remains by alkaline hydrolysis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2081 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback