TX HB773 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 71-9)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 71-9)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the recitation of the pledges of allegiance to and display of the United States and state flags at and the observation of a moment of silence at open-enrollment charter schools and other public schools.
Title
Relating to the recitation of the pledges of allegiance to and display of the United States and state flags at and the observation of a moment of silence at open-enrollment charter schools and other public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-26 - House - HB 773Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - HB 773Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Simpson (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - HB 773Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Simpson (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-20 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-20 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-05-20 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-26 | House | Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
FLAGS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
FLAGS