TX HB77 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study of the Dallas Men Against Abuse program and other activities in the Dallas community addressing family violence.
Title
Relating to a study of the Dallas Men Against Abuse program and other activities in the Dallas community addressing family violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 77Third Reading House (Y: 113 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-19 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-03-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-02-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-02-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |