TX HB766 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the entry into the Texas Crime Information Center of certain information regarding orders imposing a condition of bond in a criminal case involving a violent offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the entry into the Texas Crime Information Center of certain information regarding orders imposing a condition of bond in a criminal case involving a violent offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#168 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 See remarks for effective date
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#168
2021-04-13HousePassed
2021-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB766
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00766I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00766H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00766E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00766S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00766F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00766I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00766H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00766H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00766E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00766E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB766&RcdVtNo=168&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments 750

feedback